NY A01679 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits smoking within fifty feet of all entrances to state office buildings and restricts smoking outside buildings with indoor smoking restrictions; sets forth definitions of state office and state agency.
Title
Prohibits smoking within fifty feet of all entrances to state office buildings and restricts smoking outside buildings with indoor smoking restrictions; sets forth definitions of state office and state agency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to health |