NY A01628 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adjustment of maximum allowable rent.
Title
Relates to adjustment of maximum allowable rent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.827 |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | referred to housing |