NY A01622 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "private environmental law enforcement act"; authorizes any private citizen who has an interest which is or may be adversely affected to commence civil judicial actions for injunctive or declaratory relief to remedy environmental harms under certain circumstances; provides that such action may be commenced against any person for any violation of an administrative or court order compelling an investigation or remediation of an inactive hazardous waste disposal site.
Title
Enacts "private environmental law enforcement act"; authorizes any private citizen who has an interest which is or may be adversely affected to commence civil judicial actions for injunctive or declaratory relief to remedy environmental harms under certain circumstances; provides that such action may be commenced against any person for any violation of an administrative or court order compelling an investigation or remediation of an inactive hazardous waste disposal site.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2023-01-17 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07913 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION