NY A01580 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-10)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-08 - held for consideration in agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-08 - held for consideration in agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a person convicted of "Buster's Law" from owning or possessing a companion animal unless authorized by court order, after appropriate psychiatric or psychological testing.
Title
Prohibits a person convicted of "Buster's Law" from owning or possessing a companion animal unless authorized by court order, after appropriate psychiatric or psychological testing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Assembly | held for consideration in agriculture |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2011-01-10 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S05084 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES