NY A01549 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-12 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-12 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits a landlord to inspect dwellings and exterminate bedbug infestations upon reasonable notice.
Title
Permits a landlord to inspect dwellings and exterminate bedbug infestations upon reasonable notice.
Sponsors
Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Michael Miller [D] | Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] |
Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Annette Robinson [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.84 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.204 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.204 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | print number 1549a |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to housing |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to housing |