NY A01539 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires police officers and peace officers to immediately report any discharge of their weapon to the agency which employs them.
Title
An act to amend the penal law, in relation to requiring a police officer or peace officer to report the discharge of his or her weapon to the law enforcement agency employing such officer
Sponsors
Asm. Thomas Alfano [R] | Asm. Karim Camara [D] | Asm. Michael DenDekker [D] | Sen. Adriano Espaillat [D] |
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Sen. Jose Peralta [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | enacting clause stricken | |
2010-01-06 | referred to codes | |
2009-01-07 | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S2083 (Same As) 2010-05-10 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN