NY A01533 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.118
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.118
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to court ordered forensic evaluations and reports in child custody and visitation proceedings.
Title
Relates to court ordered forensic evaluations and reports in child custody and visitation proceedings.
Sponsors
Asm. Helene Weinstein [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Edward Braunstein [D] |
Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.118 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.30 |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06300 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES