NY A01525 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Decreases the amount of alcohol in a person's system necessary to be considered to be intoxicated while hunting.
Title
Decreases the amount of alcohol in a person's system necessary to be considered to be intoxicated while hunting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.117 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.384 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |