NY A01512 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - print number 1512a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - print number 1512a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for reimbursement of transportation costs for emergency care without prior authorization by the social services official including emergency medical transportation by an ambulance service certified under article 30 of the public health law; and further authorizes the commissioner of health to establish a reimbursement methodology to ensure providers are reimbursed.
Title
Allows for reimbursement of transportation costs for emergency care without prior authorization by the social services official including emergency medical transportation by an ambulance service certified under article 30 of the public health law; and further authorizes the commissioner of health to establish a reimbursement methodology to ensure providers are reimbursed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-12 | Assembly | print number 1512a |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01055 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - PRINT NUMBER 1055A