NY A01505 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the adoption of rules and regulations by state and local government entities prior to the effective date of an act of the legislature which necessitates such rules, regulations or actions.
Title
Permits the adoption of rules and regulations by state and local government entities prior to the effective date of an act of the legislature which necessitates such rules, regulations or actions.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] |
Asm. Robert Carroll [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S08768 (Same As) 2020-07-15 - REFERRED TO RULES