NY A01475 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipalities in the county of Rockland to add unpaid housing code violation penalties, costs and fines to such municipalities' annual tax levy in accordance with applicable law.
Title
Authorizes municipalities in the county of Rockland to add unpaid housing code violation penalties, costs and fines to such municipalities' annual tax levy in accordance with applicable law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-06-16 | Assembly | print number 1475b |
2018-06-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | print number 1475a |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S01773 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES