NY A01466 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - print number 1466c
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Implements the "New York State Build Public Renewables Act"; requires the New York power authority to provide only renewable energy and power to customers; requires such authority to be the sole provider of energy to all state owned and municipal properties; requires certain New York power authority projects and programs pay a prevailing wage and utilize project labor agreements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implements the "New York State Build Public Renewables Act"; requires the New York power authority to provide only renewable energy and power to customers; requires such authority to be the sole provider of energy to all state owned and municipal properties; requires certain New York power authority projects and programs pay a prevailing wage and utilize project labor agreements.

Sponsors

Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]
Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]
Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]
Asm. David Weprin [D]Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Zohran Kwame Mamdani [D]Asm. Phara Souffrant Forrest [D]
Asm. Emily Gallagher [D]Asm. Khaleel Anderson [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Charles Barron [D]
Asm. Jessica Gonzalez-Rojas [D]Asm. Marcela Mitaynes [D]Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]Asm. Chantel Jackson [D]
Asm. Christopher Burdick [D]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Gina Sillitti [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]
Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]
Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Sarah Clark [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]
Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Kenneth Burgos [D]Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]
Asm. Anna Kelles [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Amanda Septimo [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]
Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Simcha Eichenstein [D]Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]Asm. Patrick Burke [D]
Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Erik Dilan [D]
Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Eddie Gibbs [D]Asm. Manny De Los Santos [D]Asm. Brian Cunningham [D]
Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Yudelka Tapia [D]Asm. Stefani Zinerman [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]
Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]

Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-23Assemblyprint number 1466c
2022-05-23Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2022-05-09Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2022-04-20Assemblyprint number 1466b
2022-04-20Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2022-01-05Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2021-04-12Assemblyprint number 1466a
2021-04-12Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2021-01-11Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S06453 (Same As) 2022-05-20 - PRINT NUMBER 6453B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A1466
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01466&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01466
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01466&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01466A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01466&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01466B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01466&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01466C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01466&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1

Bill Comments

feedback