NY A01442 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 13 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-10-13 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the metropolitan transportation authority open data act; establishes requirements for the reporting of data based on ridership, routes, and services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the metropolitan transportation authority open data act; establishes requirements for the reporting of data based on ridership, routes, and services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2021-06-01SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-01Senate3RD READING CAL.1237
2021-06-01SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4625A
2021-06-01SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2021-06-01Assemblydelivered to senate
2021-06-01Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-01Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.161
2021-06-01Assemblyrules report cal.161
2021-06-01Assemblyreported
2021-05-25Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-05-19Assemblyprint number 1442b
2021-05-19Assemblyamend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2021-02-01Assemblyprint number 1442a
2021-02-01Assemblyamend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2021-01-11Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S04625 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1442B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A1442
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01442&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01442
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01442&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01442A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01442&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01442B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01442&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01442&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A1442#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01442&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback