NY A01378 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - print number 1378a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - print number 1378a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain cities to implement a pilot truck weight photo-monitoring system at certain intersections throughout the city; requires owners of trucks to be monetarily liable when an operator of their truck drives the truck on a public highway in violation of a posted "No Truck" zone; establishes certain affirmative defenses.
Title
Authorizes certain cities to implement a pilot truck weight photo-monitoring system at certain intersections throughout the city; requires owners of trucks to be monetarily liable when an operator of their truck drives the truck on a public highway in violation of a posted "No Truck" zone; establishes certain affirmative defenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Assembly | print number 1378a |
2016-05-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00160 (Same As) 2016-04-29 - PRINT NUMBER 160A