NY A01316 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-5)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - signed chap.3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-5)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - signed chap.3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the stretch limousine passenger safety task force to conduct a comprehensive review of matters influencing the safety, adequacy, efficiency, and reliability of stretch limousine transportation of passengers for compensation.
Title
Establishes the stretch limousine passenger safety task force to conduct a comprehensive review of matters influencing the safety, adequacy, efficiency, and reliability of stretch limousine transportation of passengers for compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | signed chap.3 |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.78 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6189C |
2020-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.2 |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.2 |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | print number 1316c |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | print number 1316b |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | print number 1316a |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to transportation |