NY A01310 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-10 - signed chap.583
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-10 - signed chap.583
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the issuance of a New York State Korean War Commemorative Medal.
Title
Relates to the issuance of a New York State Korean War Commemorative Medal.
Sponsors
Asm. William Magnarelli [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-10 | Assembly | signed chap.583 |
2022-11-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1848 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2091C |
2022-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.100 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.100 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 1310b |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | print number 1310a |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S02091 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1310B