NY A01310 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to code enforcement officer training and certification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to code enforcement officer training and certification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-03-29SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-03-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-03-29Senate3RD READING CAL.204
2017-03-29SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1642
2017-03-22SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
2017-03-22Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-03-22Assemblypassed assembly
2017-03-16Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.134
2017-03-13Assemblyreported
2017-03-07Assemblyreported referred to codes
2017-01-11Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S01642 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1310

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01310&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01310&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01310
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01310&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01310&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01310&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A1310#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback