NY A01169 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-12 - amended on third reading 1169c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-12 - amended on third reading 1169c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to ALS (Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis) research and education; creates the New York ALS research and education fund.
Title
Relates to ALS (Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis) research and education; creates the New York ALS research and education fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1169c |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1169b |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.70 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.73 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.73 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | print number 1169a |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02004 (Same As) 2014-06-13 - PRINT NUMBER 2004C