NY A01137 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - print number 1137d
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - print number 1137d
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates lay individuals as one-day marriage officiants in order to solemnize marriages.
Title
Designates lay individuals as one-day marriage officiants in order to solemnize marriages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Assembly | print number 1137d |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | print number 1137c |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-02-26 | Assembly | print number 1137b |
2018-02-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2017-03-10 | Assembly | print number 1137a |
2017-03-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05858 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - referred to ways and means