NY A01133 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends procedures for making anatomical gifts; specifies persons authorized to make an anatomical gift under certain circumstances; provides procedures for amending and revoking gifts.
Title
Amends procedures for making anatomical gifts; specifies persons authorized to make an anatomical gift under certain circumstances; provides procedures for amending and revoking gifts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | print number 1133d |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | print number 1133c |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | print number 1133b |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | print number 1133a |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01342 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN