NY A01119 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - advanced to third reading cal.177
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates a private right of action for improper debt collection procedures; allows plaintiffs to recover punitive damages and reasonable attorneys' fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a private right of action for improper debt collection procedures; allows plaintiffs to recover punitive damages and reasonable attorneys' fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.177
2019-04-09Assemblyreported
2019-03-05Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S01835 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback