NY A01093 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - signed chap.476
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to authorizing additional paid leave for health related services for certain employees not employed by the state who served in a combat theater or combat zone of operations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to authorizing additional paid leave for health related services for certain employees not employed by the state who served in a combat theater or combat zone of operations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-11Senatesigned chap.476
2019-11-08Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.1022
2019-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5285A
2019-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.321
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.321
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-23Assemblyprint number 1093b
2019-05-23Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-04-08Assemblyprint number 1093a
2019-04-08Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S01349 (Same As) 2019-01-14 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
S05285 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1093B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01093&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01093&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01093
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01093&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01093A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01093&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01093B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01093&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01093&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01093&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A1093#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01093&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback