NY A01064 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-06 - ordered to third reading cal.95
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-06 - ordered to third reading cal.95
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would require the Public Service Commission ("PSC") to adopt policies and procedures to avoid unnecessary or premature addition of new telephone area codes at significant cost and inconvenience to telephone consumers through conservation in the initial allocation of telephone numbers and exchange codes and reclamation of underutilized exchange codes and unused telephone numbers for reallocation to higher priority areas. This bill would also require the PSC to assign an administrative law judge to conduct evidentiary proceedings and to issue a recommended decision on any proposed addition of a new area code.
Title
Establishes investigation, hearing and determination procedures for the public service commission with respect to the creation of new area codes; appoints administrative law judge to decide the need for additional area codes; provides possible alternatives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.95 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-05-06 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | |
2009-05-06 | delivered to senate | |
2009-05-06 | passed assembly | |
2009-04-09 | advanced to third reading cal.303 | |
2009-04-07 | reported | |
2009-01-07 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S3260 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS