NY A01060 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - approval memo.1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - approval memo.1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives; authorizes a licensed physician and a certified nurse practitioner to prescribe and order a non-patient specific order to a pharmacist licensed and located in the state for the dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives.
Title
Relates to the dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives; authorizes a licensed physician and a certified nurse practitioner to prescribe and order a non-patient specific order to a pharmacist licensed and located in the state for the dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Assembly | approval memo.1 |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | signed chap.128 |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-03-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-31 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.153 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1043A |
2023-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.110 |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.110 |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | reported |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-03-08 | Assembly | print number 1060a |
2023-03-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |
2023-01-13 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S01043 (Same As) 2023-03-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1060A