NY A01025 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - substituted by s627a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - substituted by s627a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Finances the construction, reconstruction, improvement, expansion or rehabilitation of wholesale regional farmers' markets and food hubs that promote farm products grown in New York state.
Title
Finances the construction, reconstruction, improvement, expansion or rehabilitation of wholesale regional farmers' markets and food hubs that promote farm products grown in New York state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s627a |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.405 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.405 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | print number 1025a |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2012-04-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2011-01-13 | Assembly | reference changed to agriculture |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S00627 (Same As) 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.298