NY A00986 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - REFERRED TO BANKS
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - REFERRED TO BANKS
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of financial services to study, evaluate and make recommendations concerning licensure, limits on fees and interest and disclosure practices of businesses engaged in pension loan advancements.
Title
Directs the department of financial services to study, evaluate and make recommendations concerning licensure, limits on fees and interest and disclosure practices of businesses engaged in pension loan advancements.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] | Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Michael Miller [D] |
Asm. Walter Mosley [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.35 |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.35 |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-28 | Assembly | print number 986a |
2016-01-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to banks |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | committed to banks |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.46 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.54 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.54 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-08 | Assembly | referred to banks |