NY A00980 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits persons or business entities from filing unnecessary personal identifying information with an agency; provides for enforcement by the attorney general.
Title
Prohibits persons or business entities from filing unnecessary personal identifying information with an agency; provides for enforcement by the attorney general.
Sponsors
Asm. Audrey Pheffer [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. David McDonough [R] |
Asm. Helene Weinstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2011-05-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-05-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.193 |
2011-04-11 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |