NY A00955 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - signed chap.113
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - signed chap.113
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to insurers providing an actuarially appropriate reduction of premiums for yacht or boating liability insurance.
Title
Relates to insurers providing an actuarially appropriate reduction of premiums for yacht or boating liability insurance.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Assembly | signed chap.113 |
2021-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-04-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.78 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1307 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.3 |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.3 |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S01307 (Same As) 2021-04-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A955