NY A00935 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-15 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-15 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes boards of education or trustees of school districts to allow certain pupils diagnosed with asthma or other potentially life-threatening respiratory illnesses to carry and use a prescribed inhaler; provides for establishment of asthma action plans for such pupils.
Title
Authorizes boards of education or trustees of school districts to allow certain pupils diagnosed with asthma or other potentially life-threatening respiratory illnesses to carry and use a prescribed inhaler; provides for establishment of asthma action plans for such pupils.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2012-05-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.540 |
2012-05-09 | Assembly | reported |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to education |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06369 (Same As) 2012-02-01 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION