NY A00870 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Pending: Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Pending: Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the Office of Mental Health and the Office for People With Developmental Disabilities give consideration to the fiscal management practices of an applicant to operate a mental hygiene facility or program as part of the review of such individual's character and competence.
Title
Requires that the Office of Mental Health and the Office for People With Developmental Disabilities give consideration to the fiscal management practices of an applicant to operate a mental hygiene facility or program as part of the review of such individual's character and competence.
Sponsors
Asm. Ro Ann Destito [D] | Asm. Harvey Weisenberg [D] | Asm. Mark Schroeder [D] | Asm. Peter Rivera [D] |
Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. John McEneny [D] | Asm. Audrey Pheffer [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2011-03-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-03-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-01-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.23 |
2011-01-25 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to mental health |