NY A00866 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-20 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-20 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to members of the police force who use hearing assistance devices and the definition of disabled.
Title
Relates to members of the police force who use hearing assistance devices and the definition of disabled.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.667 |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05380 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CITIES