NY A00851 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants personal income taxpayers the ability to make a gift to the state parks on their tax returns; establishes the state parks fund to provide monies to the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation for the operation and maintenance of the state parks.
Title
Grants personal income taxpayers the ability to make a gift to the state parks on their tax returns; establishes the state parks fund to provide monies to the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation for the operation and maintenance of the state parks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 851a |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.43 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.455 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.455 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S00821 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS