NY A00851 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-19 - signed chap.1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-19 - signed chap.1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing property values which are exempt from the satisfaction of a money judgement and increases the exemptions in bankruptcy.
Title
Relates to increasing property values which are exempt from the satisfaction of a money judgement and increases the exemptions in bankruptcy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-19 | Senate | signed chap.1 |
2011-01-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-01-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-01-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-01-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1 |
2011-01-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1198 |
2011-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2011-01-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-01-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-01-13 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.13 |
2011-01-11 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S01198 (Same As) 2011-01-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A851