NY A00791 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-6)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - substituted by s4324a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - substituted by s4324a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to meningococcal immunizations; requires certain parents ensure the immunization of their children against meningococcal disease.
Title
Relates to meningococcal immunizations; requires certain parents ensure the immunization of their children against meningococcal disease.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s4324a |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.454 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.454 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | print number 791c |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | print number 791b |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | print number 791a |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04324 (Same As) 2015-10-26 - SIGNED CHAP.401