NY A00745 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-21 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-21 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the metropolitan transportation riders council for persons with disabilities; provides for membership and powers and duties.
Title
Establishes the metropolitan transportation riders council for persons with disabilities; provides for membership and powers and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.53 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.239 |
2011-05-03 | Assembly | reported |
2011-03-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S01238 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION