NY A00744 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a disability benefit for employees of the New York city transit authority, and its subsidiary corporations, who are disabled by reason of an assault sustained in the course of employment.
Title
Provides for a disability benefit for employees of the New York city transit authority, and its subsidiary corporations, who are disabled by reason of an assault sustained in the course of employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-10 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2023-10-04 | Assembly | reference changed to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2023-01-11 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |