NY A00725 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-28 - substituted by s5943
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-28 - substituted by s5943
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies the order in which candidates appear on the ballot; requires that offices shall be listed on the ballot in descending order based on the size of the electorate and requires certain federal offices to be listed before state, county or local offices.
Title
Modifies the order in which candidates appear on the ballot; requires that offices shall be listed on the ballot in descending order based on the size of the electorate and requires certain federal offices to be listed before state, county or local offices.
Sponsors
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. Gina Sillitti [D] | Asm. Monica Wallace [D] |
Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Christopher Eachus [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Assembly | substituted by s5943 |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.23 |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.125 |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | reported |
2023-01-11 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S05943 (Same As) 2024-08-06 - SIGNED CHAP.217