NY A00711 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires debt collectors to inform debtors in each initial communication that written communications are available in large print format.
Title
Requires debt collectors to inform debtors in each initial communication that written communications are available in large print format.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.35 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.125 |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S04394 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION