NY A00707 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits pre-payment penalties for mortgages secured by real property owned in a cooperative form of ownership where over fifty percent of the units are shareholder occupied.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits pre-payment penalties for mortgages secured by real property owned in a cooperative form of ownership where over fifty percent of the units are shareholder occupied.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2023-02-08Assemblyreference changed to judiciary
2023-01-11Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S00161 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback