NY A00648 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.145
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.145
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes care and services provided by licensed mental health practitioners eligible for coverage under the Medicaid program.
Title
Makes care and services provided by licensed mental health practitioners eligible for coverage under the Medicaid program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.145 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.91 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a648a |
2019-06-17 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.815 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 3421A |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s3421a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.91 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.91 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | print number 648a |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03421 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.145