NY A00629 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - print number 629b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - print number 629b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the ability of a fare-paying passenger in a transportation network company vehicle and the driver of such vehicle to consent to sexual activity inside such vehicle.
Title
Relates to the ability of a fare-paying passenger in a transportation network company vehicle and the driver of such vehicle to consent to sexual activity inside such vehicle.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Assembly | print number 629b |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | print number 629a |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00814 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CODES