NY A00591 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-10 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-10 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for clarification of the disposition of human remains.
Title
Provides for clarification of the disposition of human remains.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.31 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2011-02-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-02-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-01-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.16 |
2011-01-19 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04540 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO HEALTH