NY A00584 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - substituted by s660
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the prohibition of discrimination based on an individual's or a dependent's reproductive health decision making.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the prohibition of discrimination based on an individual's or a dependent's reproductive health decision making.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22Assemblysubstituted by s660
2019-01-17Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.7
2019-01-15Assemblyreported
2019-01-15Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S00660 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback