NY A00503 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the safe storage of rifles, shotguns, or firearms.
Title
Relates to the safe storage of rifles, shotguns, or firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S01764 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN