NY A00480 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - print number 480a
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - print number 480a
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to tax abatement for rent-controlled and rent regulated property occupied by and real property owned by senior citizens or persons with disabilities.
Title
Relates to tax abatement for rent-controlled and rent regulated property occupied by and real property owned by senior citizens or persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Assembly | print number 480a |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to aging |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S04216 (Same As) 2022-04-21 - PRINT NUMBER 4216A