NY A00458 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - substituted by s4756
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that public buildings with multi-line telephone systems configure their system hardware in order to allow any call placed to 911, to be directly connected to a public service answering point.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that public buildings with multi-line telephone systems configure their system hardware in order to allow any call placed to 911, to be directly connected to a public service answering point.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13Assemblysubstituted by s4756
2019-05-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.217
2019-04-30Assemblyreported
2019-03-19Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S04756 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback