NY A00413 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-07 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-07 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Develops comprehensive assessment centers for autism spectrum disorders.
Title
Develops comprehensive assessment centers for autism spectrum disorders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-01-09 | Assembly | print number 413a |
2012-01-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
2011-01-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06169 (Same As) 2012-01-09 - REFERRED TO HEALTH