NY A00371 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - substituted by s977
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - substituted by s977
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires telemarketers to transmit to consumers the correct caller identification information.
Title
Requires telemarketers to transmit to consumers the correct caller identification information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Assembly | substituted by s977 |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.23 |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.23 |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S00977 (Same As) 2017-03-15 - SIGNED CHAP.18