NY A00346 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a study by the department of corrections and community supervision pertaining to the treatment of aging prison populations.
Title
Authorizes a study by the department of corrections and community supervision pertaining to the treatment of aging prison populations.
Sponsors
Asm. Latoya Joyner [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
Sen. Nathalia Fernandez [D] | Asm. Tremaine Wright [D] | Asm. Catalina Cruz [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.15 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.468 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S04743 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION