NY A00285 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-25 - amended on third reading (t) 285a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-25 - amended on third reading (t) 285a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the date for the accrual of certain causes of action based on negligence.
Title
Establishes the date for the accrual of certain causes of action based on negligence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-25 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 285a |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.20 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.45 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.45 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to codes |